judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAHNS VS. VON BRAUER

Case Information: 79773
Short Caption:BAHNS VS. VON BRAUERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 79773-COA , 79774 , 80717
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D503346Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/09/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
10/09/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) 19-41819
10/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) 19-41821
10/14/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC)
10/15/2019Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nakia Dawn Bahns. Money Order no. 19-031756403. (SC)
10/15/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) 19-42697
10/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Due: 30 days. (SC) 19-43495
11/01/2019Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/30/14, 05/21/19, 07/29/19. To Court Reporter: Video Transcript Services. (SC). 19-45077
11/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1A. (SC) 19-45419
11/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1B - PART 1. (SC) 19-45420
11/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1B - PART 2. (SC) 19-45440
11/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal- VOL 2. (SC) 19-45421
11/05/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 3. (SC) 19-45422
11/06/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: November 19, 2019. (SC). 19-45550
11/12/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 165 to 169 and 343 to 349 (SEALED). (SC)
02/10/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 26, 2020. (SC). 20-05531
03/03/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Amended) (SC) 20-08446
03/09/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Confidential Civil Coversheet. (SC)
03/24/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has not filed the docketing statement or the opening brief. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement and the opening brief or the "informal brief for pro se parties" provided by this court. (SC) 20-11369
04/14/2020Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (DETACHED EXHIBITS AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 4/21/20). (SC). 20-14156
04/21/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 14, 2020, appellant filed a docketing statement containing substantial argument, which this court construes as the informal opening brief. The clerk of this court shall detach the exhibits from the brief and return them to appellant unfiled. Respondent need not file a response to the brief unless directed to do so by this court. (SC) 20-15109
04/29/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion Under NRAP 13 for an Order to Show Cause on Steven D. Grierson, The Clerk of the Court of the Eighth Judicial District Court; and Amanda Hampton, Deputy Clerk, Clark County, Nevada for Their Failure to Transmit a Full and Correct Copy of the Complete Trial Court Record Pursuant to NRAP 11; and Motion Under NRAP 11 to Transmit a Full and Correct Copy of the Complete Trial Court Record on Appeal for Case No. D-14-503346-Z, Dept. J. (SC) 20-16177
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's "Motion Under NRAP 13 for an Order to Show Cause on Steven D. Grierson, The Clerk of the Court of the Eighth Judicial District Court; and Amanda Hampton, Deputy Clerk, Clark County, Nevada for Their Failure to Transmit a Full and Correct Copy of the Complete Trial Court Record Pursuant to NRAP 11; and Motion Under NRAP 11 to Transmit a Full and Correct Copy of the Complete Trial Court Record on Appeal for Case No. D-14-503346-Z, Dept. J" is denied. (SC). 20-17504
05/27/2020MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Amended Motion Under NRAP 11 to Transmit a Full and Correct Copy of the Complete Trial Court Record; and in Chronological Order Beginning with ROA 1 Through ROA 549 for Case No. D-14-503346-Z- Dep. J, Rena G. Hughes. (SC) 20-20072
06/04/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's "Amended Motion Under NRAP 11 to Transmit a Full and Correct Copy of the Complete Trial Court Record; and in Chronological Order Beginning with ROA 1 Through ROA 549 for Case No. D-14-503346-Z- Dep. J, Rena G. Hughes" is denied. (SC) 20-21080
06/09/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
07/09/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) 20-25381
07/09/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
10/16/2020Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
11/10/2020Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
11/10/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC). 20-41102
11/10/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
12/11/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 16, 2020. (SC) 20-41102