judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WANDREIA M. LINDSAY-STOKES V. HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN

Case Information: 11-AA-0405
Short Caption:WANDREIA M. LINDSAY-STOKES V. HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDRENClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00294-11Filed Date:04/04/2011

Opening Event Date:04/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/05/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerWandeia Lindsay-Stokes NPro SeN
RespondentHospital for Sick ChildrenN
Benjamin W. HahnNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/04/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
04/04/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
04/04/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
04/12/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Hospital for Sick Children is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
05/03/2011APPEARANCE- of Benjamin W. Hahn on behalf of respondent
03/05/2012FiledRecord On Appeal
03/05/2012FiledRecord Completed
03/14/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/01/2012FiledOrder directing motion, brief & appendix
05/29/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
05/29/2012FiledDismissed
06/20/2012FiledMandate