judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLEMAN (ALEXANDER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34985
Short Caption:COLEMAN (ALEXANDER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990537Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10044
10/19/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 14 and 15, 1999. Court Reporter: Kate Ramage. 99-10159
10/19/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 1, 1999. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 99-10160
11/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11103
11/10/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-11104
12/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11963
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09972
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11852
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 13, 2000. 00-11852