judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTHONY EDWARD SILVEIRA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0235)
Case Number:S-11-0235Case Docketed On:10/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:ANTHONY EDWARD SILVEIRA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANTHONY EDWARD SILVEIRA Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnthony Edward SilveiraDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/16/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/19/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal