Case: 03-94-00524-CV
03-94-00524-CV
09/30/1994
Contract
Austin Auto Brokers and Mohammad Assadi
Ed Vera, Inc., d/b/a Vera Motors
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/23/2004 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
10/01/1997 | CASE STORED | | |||
10/11/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/16/1995 | Amended motion to dismiss disposed | Overruled | | ||
08/16/1995 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Dismissed | | ||
08/16/1995 | Opinion issued | Modified and, as Modified, Affirmed |
| ||
07/10/1995 | Submitted | | |||
07/10/1995 | Submission | | |||
06/19/1995 | Submission | | |||
05/25/1995 | miscellaneous motion disp | Dismissed | | ||
05/09/1995 | miscellaneous motion filed | | |||
05/05/1995 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |||
05/02/1995 | Letter received | | |||
05/01/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |||
05/01/1995 | Brief filed | | |||
03/30/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/30/1995 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Dismissed | | ||
03/13/1995 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/02/1995 | Response requested (postcard) | | |||
02/24/1995 | Amended motion filed | | |||
02/21/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/12/1995 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/12/1995 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
12/28/1994 | Brief filed | | |||
12/28/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/20/1994 | Brief received, not filed | | |||
12/09/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
11/29/1994 | Amended motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/29/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Dismissed | | ||
11/15/1994 | Amended motion filed | | |||
11/10/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
09/30/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |||
09/30/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/11/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ed Vera, Inc.,d/b/a Vera Motor | Appellee | Mr. John C. D. Drolla Jr. |
Austin Auto Brokers | Appellant | Mr. Kenneth A. Richey |
Trial Court Information
201st District Court
Travis
Honorable Jon N. Wisser
94-04952