judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GARY A. MITCHESON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0236)
Case Number:S-11-0236Case Docketed On:10/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GARY A. MITCHESON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: GARY A. MITCHESON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary A. MitchesonRobert A. Nicholas
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John D. Rossetti
Kelly Roseberry
Michael J. Finn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 74
Citation:277 P.3d 725

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of CounselNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/29/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received respondent's designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2012Event - Phone Call - received phone call from clerk's office. Appellant designated entire record. They will fax designations and index for review.EventPhone CallFinal
01/20/2012Order - Directing Counsel to File a Designation Pursuant to Wyo. R. App. P. 3.05OrderOtherFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/07/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/10/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/25/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/30/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/31/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Attorney Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/19/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/19/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/19/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/20/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal