judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY T. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0408
Short Caption:ANTHONY T. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1128-10Filed Date:03/24/2011

Opening Event Date:03/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/28/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony T. Thompson Y
Vicki C. BryantYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. Gidez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/24/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Vickie Bryant, Esquire, is hereby appoitned to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
04/12/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Vickie Bryant, Esquire
05/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (2 pgs. -- Tape) (5/14/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (13 pgs. -- Tape) (5/15/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (32 pgs. -- Tape) (5/21/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (5 pgs. -- Tape) (6/25/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (5 pgs. -- Tape) (7/7/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (19 pgs. -- Tape) (9/9/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (27 pgs. -- Tape) 9/27/10 proc.).
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (20 pgs. -- Tape) (10/19/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (14 pgs. -- Tape) (10/27/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (27 pgs. -- Tape) (12/7/10 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #11 (7 pgs. -- Tape) (1/7/11 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #12 (105 pgs. -- Henderson) (2/24/11 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #13 (53 pgs. -- Wood) (2/23/11 proc.) with CD.
06/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/29/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX
07/07/2011RECORD COPIES
08/08/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/08/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant) (attached to Brief)
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/12/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
01/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
01/30/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/22/2012FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument or for the submitted briefs to substitute for the subject argument (Appellant)
03/23/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/08/2012FiledArgued Before Fisher,Oberly,Wagner, Vicki C. Bryant Esq.,for appellant, John P. Gidez Esq.,for appellee,
12/05/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Wagner, Senior Judge)
12/28/2012FiledMandate