judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2733
B-2733
05/17/1971
MISC PETITION
PATSY RUTH MCHONE
HON. DAN GIBBS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/28/1971Supplement to Petition filedRelator
07/28/1971Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
06/18/1971Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/18/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/26/1971Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
05/26/1971Brief on the MeritsRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/28/1971Concurring Opinion issued.
07/28/1971Opinion issued
07/28/1971Supplement to Petition filed
07/28/1971Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
07/26/1971Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
06/18/1971Brief on the Merits
06/18/1971Response to Petition
05/26/1971Exhibits in case/cause filed
05/26/1971Brief on the Merits
05/17/1971Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Dan Gibbs, et al.Respondent
Patsy Ruth McHoneRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information