judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH VS. SMITH, BURNETT & RUSSELL, LTD.

Case Information: 34987
Short Caption:SMITH VS. SMITH, BURNETT & RUSSELL, LTD.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33349 , 34301
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A328159Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Leavitt, Sully & Rivers.
10/18/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Elizabeth Foley--check no. 2673.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10065
10/21/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Wright Judd & Winckler--check no. 4134.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second Notice of Appeal filed by appellant Brian Vandendries. 99-10325
10/25/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Leavitt, Sully & Rivers--check no. 5004.
10/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed by Smith, Burnett & Russell, Ltd. 99-10448
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/14/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-02300
02/14/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-02301
03/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." SNP/CLK 00-03511
03/06/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.