judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KRISTEN N. SPREEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0237)
Case Number:S-11-0237Case Docketed On:10/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:KRISTEN N. SPREEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KRISTEN N. SPREEMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKristen N. SpreemanDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Jackson Matthew Engels

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2012 WY 88
Citation:278 P.3d 1159

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/01/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/18/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jackson M. Engels obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tina N. Olson obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/16/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/14/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson for Appellant and Jackson Matthew Engels for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal