judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES SCALES, ET AL V. ROSENBURG & ASSOCIATES

Case Information: 11-CV-0409
Short Caption:JAMES SCALES, ET AL V. ROSENBURG & ASSOCIATESClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5029-10Filed Date:03/25/2011

Opening Event Date:03/25/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Scales N
Ian StumpfNN
AppellantApril Ward N
Ian StumpfNN
AppelleeRosenburg & AssociatesN
Azer AkhtarNY
AppelleeWells Fargo Bank N.A.N
Michael S. BarrancoNY
AppelleeWachovia Mortgage CorporationN
Michael S. BarrancoNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/19/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANTS SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be disissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
04/19/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
05/09/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
06/06/2011 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS DISMISSED as having been taken from a non-final order. (FITEKG)
06/06/2011DISMISSED
07/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED