judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FITZSIMMONS VS. WISHART

Case Information: 38400
Short Caption:FITZSIMMONS VS. WISHARTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0102104Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/13/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14661
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-15000
09/13/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-15492
09/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn5 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 01-20958
01/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant was not granted leave of this court to file briefs and papers in proper person. On December 13, 2001, this court affirmed the district court's order. Accordingly, appellant's December 19, 2001 motion for a second enlargement of time in which to file the opening brief is denied as moot. 02-00340
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 02-00258
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 10, 2002. 02-00258