judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARY DANIEL CONRAD, EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF GROVER C. CONRAD, DECEASED v. RUBY WANDA JUDSON, BETTY T. TREADAWAY, KATHRYN L. MCCARTHY, NATHLYN L. MURDOCH, AND FRANCES I. STEVENSON ROSE

Case: B-2729
B-2729
05/13/1971
Application for Writ of Error
MARY DANIEL CONRAD, EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF GROVER C. CONRAD, DECEASED
RUBY WANDA JUDSON, BETTY T. TREADAWAY, KATHRYN L. MCCARTHY, NATHLYN L. MURDOCH, AND FRANCES I. STEVENSON ROSE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/30/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/05/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/20/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/12/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
05/31/1971Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/23/1971Motion for Leave to file Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/30/1971Reply to Response
09/24/1971Response to Motion filed
08/10/1971Letter Filed
08/05/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/20/1971Response to Brief filed
07/12/1971Response to Petition
06/03/1971Response to Motion filed
05/31/1971Brief on the Merits
05/26/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
05/13/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mary Daniel Conrad, Executrix of the Estate of Grover C. Conrad, deceasedPetitioner
Ruby Wanda Judson, Betty T. Treadaway, Kathryn L. McCarthy, Nathlyn L. Murdoch, and Frances I. Stevenson RoseRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information