Case Information: 13-FM-1478 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVID EARL WILLIAMS, III V. CHENELYN BARKER | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CPO3835-13 | Filed Date: | 12/13/2013 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/13/2013 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 04/09/2014 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/06/2014 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | David Earl Williams, III | Y |
| ||||||
Appellee | Chenelyn Barker | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/13/2013 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
01/06/2014 | Filed | Initial Order - directing statement regarding transcript | ||
01/27/2014 | Filed | Statement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) | ||
03/13/2014 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 (199-ps/tape 12/12/13 proc) | ||
04/09/2014 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/06/2014 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
07/16/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
07/21/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) - 7/31/14 | ||
07/31/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
08/22/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | ||
09/25/2014 | Filed | Order - directing motion, brief & appendix (Appellant) | ||
10/08/2014 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
10/08/2014 | Filed | Record Index | ||
10/15/2014 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
10/15/2014 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
11/06/2014 | Filed | Mandate |