judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EWING (TADZIU) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38399
Short Caption:EWING (TADZIU) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42053
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR002265Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14656
08/29/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 9th and July 10th, 2001 and August 14, 2001. Court Reporters: E. Nelson and K. Murray. Filed in district court on: August 24, 2001. 01-14657
09/04/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 9 & 10, 2001. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson and Denise Phipps. 01-14936
09/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 14, 2001. Court Reporter: Kate Murray. 01-15171
10/05/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: October 15, 2001. 01-16758
10/12/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17282
10/12/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-17283
11/02/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18364
11/02/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-18365
11/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Ewing's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20038
12/26/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20112
12/26/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2002. 01-20112