judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF U.S. CURRENCY TOTALING $7,209.00: JOSEPH LIBRETTI and FRANK A. HOHLIOS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0243)
Case Number:S-11-0243Case Docketed On:10/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF U.S. CURRENCY TOTALING $7,209.00: JOSEPH LIBRETTI and FRANK A. HOHLIOS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF U.S. CURRENCY TOTALING $7,209.00: JOSEPH LIBRETTI and FRANK A. HOHLIOS, Appellants (Claimants), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph Libretti Pro Se
AppellantFrank A. Hohlios Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2012 WY 75
Citation:278 P.3d 234

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/28/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of address by Mr. Libretti. Address changed in systemNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of address - Joseph Libretti. Address changed in system.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
01/11/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/12/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/23/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/30/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/30/2012Correspondence - Outgoing - Re second Appellants' Reply Brief receivedCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
01/31/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/06/2012Motion - Appellant Joseph Libretti's Motion for Leave to File a Separate Reply BriefMotionOtherFinal
02/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Joseph V. LibrettiNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
02/06/2012Service - Mail returned. Sent to Mr. Libretti. Resent to new addressServiceMail returnedFinal
02/09/2012Service - Mail returned, three pieces: letter re reply brief, notice of record request and order assigning to expedited docket. All forwarded to new address.ServiceMail returnedFinal
02/21/2012Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Appellant Joseph LibrettiNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/22/2012Order - Denying Motion for Leave to File a Second Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
05/30/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/15/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/19/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/18/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal