judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JEFFREY R. WILLIAMS

Case Information: 11-BG-0379
Short Caption:IN RE: JEFFREY R. WILLIAMSClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/24/2011

Opening Event Date:03/24/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJeffrey R. Williams NPro SeN
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/24/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with certified copies of the docket and information regarding respondent's plea of guilty in the United States District Court, District of Maryland to willful Criminal Conflict of Interest and False Statement to a Federal Agency, violations of 18 USC Sec 203Ia)(1), 18 USC Sec 261(a)(2) and 18 USC /sec 1001(a)(2) respectively.
04/14/2011ORDER It appearing that respondent pled guilty on February 14, 2011, in the United States District Court, District of Maryland to willful criminal conflict of interest and false statement to a federal agency, the court having received certified copies of the plea and sentencing documents, and it appearing that the offense constitutes a serious crime as defined by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (b), it is ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c), that the respondent, Jeffrey R. Williams, is suspended immediately from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending resolution of this matter, and the Board on Professional Responsibility is directed to institute a formal proceeding to determine the nature of the offense and whether it involves moral turpitude within the meaning of D.C. Code Sec 11-2503 (a)(2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement based on compliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
06/20/2011RECEIVED from the Board on Professional Responsibility an order issued June 20, 2011, referring this matter to a Hearing Committee to determine (1) whether respondent's crime involves moral turpitude on the facts and (2) what final discipline is appropriate in light of respondent's conviction of a serious crime. Bar Counsel shall file a petition to determine the final discipline to be imposed.
12/03/2012FiledAffidavit (D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14). (Appellee)
03/21/2014FiledReport And Recommendation Of The BPR On Referral that the court disbar respondent on consent and that the period of disbarment run, for purposes of reinstatement, from December 3, 2012, the date respondent filed an affidavit complying with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). The Board further recommends that the court dismiss the pending criminal conviction matter as moot. (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
04/17/2014FiledDisbarred On Consent. (BR,BW,KG)
05/01/2014FiledAffidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14. (Appellee)