judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COURTNEY EVANS, as beneficiary of the Finlay Family Trust and contingent beneficiary of the Joan Henriette Finlay Trust v. PETER F. MOYER, individually and in his capacity as the Trustee of the Finlay Family Trust and the Joan Henriette Finlay Trust

Case Heading (S-11-0220)
Case Number:S-11-0220Case Docketed On:09/21/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:COURTNEY EVANS, as beneficiary of the Finlay Family Trust and contingent beneficiary of the Joan Henriette Finlay Trust v. PETER F. MOYER, individually and in his capacity as the Trustee of the Finlay Family Trust and the Joan Henriette Finlay Trust
Full Title:COURTNEY EVANS, as beneficiary of the Finlay Family Trust and contingent beneficiary of the Joan Henriette Finlay Trust, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. PETER F. MOYER, individually and in his capacity as the Trustee of the Finlay Family Trust and the Joan Henriette Finlay Trust, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCourtney EvansLance James Schuster
Carrie Jane Gorgacz
AppelleePeter F. MoyerElizabeth Moore Ibaez
Joseph F. Moore Jr.

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Trusts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 111
Citation:282 P.3d 1203 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/21/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/21/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/27/2011Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from Meredith Winn Adams. She is no longer with the DeFazio Law Office and hasn't been since May. Advised her to contact the DeFazio Law Office and have the attorney do an entry of appearance on this case.EventPhone CallFinal
11/04/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
11/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Elizabeth Moore for AppelleeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
12/16/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth N. MooreEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of AppelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/13/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/17/2012Motion - Correct a DocumentMotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
01/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Permission to File a Corrected BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2012Event - Phone Call - from counsel for Appellant. They will not be responding to the motion to file a corrected brief and have no objections. Told counsel the order on the motion would address the reply brief due date.EventPhone CallFinal
01/24/2012Order - Granting Appellee's Motion for Permission to File a Corrected BriefOrderGrantFinal
01/30/2012Brief - ReplacementBriefReplacementFinal
01/31/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's corrected briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Elizabeth Moore obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinl
02/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Lance J. Schuster obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/02/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/05/2012Event - Phone Call to AG re oral argument, counsel confirmedEventPhone CallFinal
03/13/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Lance James Schuster for Appellant,; Elizabeth Nell Moore for Appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
03/13/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/15/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/31/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/31/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/31/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/31/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/07/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/5/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal