judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34971
Short Caption:JOHNSON VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9902046Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Pierre A. Hascheff, Chartered--check no. 1414.
10/14/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Alternative Writ of Mandate. 99-09985
11/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-11033
11/29/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Plaintiff's Petition for Alternative Writ of Mandate. 99-11899
01/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge. Due from counsel for petitioner: 7 days from the date of this notice. 00-01014
01/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (service on district judge). 00-01305
02/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-02163
02/15/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Counsel. Pierre A. Hascheff, Chtd., as counsel for petitioner Lacey Johnson. (Mr. Hascheff formerly with Erwin Thompson & Hascheff.) 00-02389
03/08/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-03653
03/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.