judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLORIA J. DAVIS V. COMMUNITY FAMILY LIFE SERVICE

Case Information: 11-AA-0393
Short Caption:GLORIA J. DAVIS V. COMMUNITY FAMILY LIFE SERVICEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00336-11Filed Date:03/29/2011

Opening Event Date:03/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/02/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGloria J. Davis YPro SeN
RespondentCommunity Family Life ServicesN
Nicholas R. Hankey NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/29/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/29/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/12/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 29, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/12/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/19/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 29, 2011, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
06/03/2011APPEARANCE - of Nicholas R. Hankey as counsel for the respondent
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 3/3/11 hearing
07/22/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
09/06/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Petitioner)
11/02/2011FiledOrder scheduling on the record and petitioner's brief alone.
11/02/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/09/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Petitioner)Denied
02/17/2012FiledOrder Denying pro se petitioner's motion for oral argument.
03/08/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judge Fisher, Steadman
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
04/06/2012FiledMandate