judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANNE UHR WHITE v. CONNIE WEBB, SHANE EDEBURN, PARIS L. EDEBURN, and PAUL B. TOZER

Case Heading (S-11-0219)
Case Number:S-11-0219Case Docketed On:09/20/2011
Linked To: S-11-0218
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ANNE UHR WHITE v. CONNIE WEBB, SHANE EDEBURN, PARIS L. EDEBURN, and PAUL B. TOZER
Full Title:ANNE UHR WHITE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CONNIE WEBB, SHANE EDEBURN, PARIS L. EDEBURN, and PAUL B. TOZER, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnne Uhr White Pro Se
AppelleeConnie WebbBillie LM Addleman
Amanda Marie Good
AppelleeShane EdeburnKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppelleeParis L. EdeburnKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppelleePaul B. TozerKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Fraud
Opinion Number:2012 WY 118
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/20/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Connie Webb's motion to dismiss appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/04/2011Response/Objection - Motion - Reply to Connie Webb's motion to dismiss appealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/15/2011Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
12/19/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief (third)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/02/2012Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
03/07/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/11/2012Brief - Appellees Shane Edeburn, Paris L. Edeburn, and Paul B. TozerBriefAppelleeFinal
04/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Shane Edeburn, Paris L. Edeburn, and Paul B. Tozer; and received copy of Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/18/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Connie Webb; and received copy of Rule 3.05(c) certification.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/30/2012Brief - Appellant reply (Appellant included copy of map of subdivision)BriefAppellant replyFinal
05/09/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/09/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/07/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/25/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/25/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for by clerk's officeServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal