judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATE (RICKY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34989
Short Caption:PATE (RICKY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34516 , 34893 , 37259
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158327Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10097
11/12/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-11145
11/15/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. June 21, 1999 and June 22, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 99-11278
12/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The fast track statement shall be filed within 15 days of this order. 99-12130
12/16/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-12719
12/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-12720
01/06/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: January 12, 2000. 00-00185
01/06/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00193
01/13/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00560
01/13/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Nos. 34893 and 34989). 00-00561
02/04/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 34893. The clerk shall transfer to docket No. 34989 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 34893. This appeal from the judgment of conviction shall proceed under docket No. 34989. fn1[We deny as moot appellant's motion to consolidate these appeals. The motion indicates that counsel is under the impression that a reply brief is due on or before February 6, 2000. To the extent that the motion seeks permission to file a reply brief, it is hereby denied.] Nos. 34893, 34989. 00-01832
02/04/2000Other Other. TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 34893: 09/27/99--Filing Fee Waived: Criminal. 09/27/99--Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09/30/99--Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper perosn. This appeal is governed by NRAP3C. Attorney William wolfbrandt whall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 10/21/99--Received letter. Letter from Attorney William wolfbrandt re: his appointment as counsel in this matter. 12/06/99--Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. On October 21, 1999, this court received a letter from Wolfbrandt. We remind counsel that the proper way to request aciton from this court is by motion pursuant to NRAP 27. Counsel's letter is therefore of no effect, and Wolfbrandt remains counsel of record in this appeal. Wolfbrandt shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 15 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 12/27/99--Filed Motion/Withdraw as Counsel. 01/06/00--On December 27, 1999, appellant's counsel, William L. Wolfbrandt, filed a motion to withdraw as attorney of record. Wolfbrandt has represented to this court that Clark County Deputy Public Defender Tim O'Brien was appointed counsel during the gult phase of appellant's trial and has assumed responsibility of pursuing this appeal. O'Brien shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file with the district court a rough draft transcript request form and shall have 40 days to file the fast track statement. We decline to rule on Wolfbrandt's motion of December 27, 1999, until such time as O'Brien enters a formal appearance in this appeal. 02/04/00 Order: transferred to Docket No. 34989. 01/13/00--Filed Motion/Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Nos. 34893 and 34989).
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09976
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11862
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11862