judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BASILLO BENITEZ V. HONORABLE WENDELL P. GARDNER, JR.

Case Information: 11-OA-0011
Short Caption:BASILLO BENITEZ V. HONORABLE WENDELL P. GARDNER, JR.Classification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7539-04Filed Date:04/05/2011

Opening Event Date:04/05/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBasillo Benitez N
Joseph A. VirgilioNY
RespondentWendell P. Gardner, Jr.N
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/05/2011PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Held in Abeyance
04/11/2011FiledTMC - petition for writ of mandamus-ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE-RESPONSE
05/12/2011 ORDERED that RESPONDENTS SHALL W/N 60 DAYS from the date of this order FILE A RESPONSE to petitioner's PWM. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of the court. (RZTHPR)
07/12/2011FiledAnswer/Response to writ of mandamus (Respondent)
07/13/2011LodgedReceived - copy of Sup Crt order dtd 7/12/11 re hearing on 23-110 mot schd for 7/25/11 @ 1:30. (Respondent)
07/18/2011FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Order Denying Petition For Writ Of Mandamus/Prohibition