judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREAT STAR VS. GALUPPO C/W 34200

Case Information: 34638
Short Caption:GREAT STAR VS. GALUPPO C/W 34200Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34200 *, 34638Related Case(s): 34200
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A332094Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/13/1999 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/09/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Callister & Reynolds--check no. 24344.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07301
08/13/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09442
10/18/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Substitution of Attorneys. Mehrdad Shahshahani herby substitutes himself in proper person as attorney of record in place and stead of Sharon Green, Lawyer. (Sharon Green is not listed as counsel of record.) 99-10077
03/03/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. On October 18, 1999, attorney Sharon Green filed a document purporting to substitute her client, Mehrdad Shahshahani, in proper person for attorney Green. It appears that attorney Green inappropriately filed a substitution of counsel in this appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a) and file a docketing statement; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-03367
04/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file the docketing statement and transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why this case should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-06391
05/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/97. To Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 00-08488
05/22/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Motion to file Docketing Statement & Transcript of Proceedings). 00-08490
05/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-08493
05/23/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's orders of March 3, 2000, and April 21, 2000, or otherwise to communicate with this court. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08650
05/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This appeal having been dismissed on May 23, 2000, we deny the motion to extend time filed on May 22, 2000. 00-08913
06/14/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 00-10154
06/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (petition for rehearing) Due date: 5 days.
06/19/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Rehearing). 00-10463
06/19/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Callister and Reynolds-check no. 26149.
09/26/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Granted. Order Reinstating Appeal. On may 23, 2000, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal as abandoned. On June 14, 2000, appellant file a petition for rehearing. We grant appellant's petition for rehearing. We vacate our order of may 23, 2000, dismissing this appeal and hreby reinstate this appeal. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement and 30 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-16994
10/06/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-17707
10/31/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/26/00. 00-19147
10/31/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-19148
12/08/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21500
12/11/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief provisionally submitted on December 8, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-21648
12/11/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/06/00. 00-21501
12/13/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Motion for Enlargement of Time to file Respondent's Answering Brief and Countermotion for Reversal of the District Court Judgment. 00-21759
01/09/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 01/05/01. 01-00416
01/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On December 13, 2000, appellant filed an opposition. We elect to treat appellant's opposition as a motion for reconsideration of the clerk's order entered on December 11, 2000. No good cause appearing, we deny appellant's motion for reconsideration filed on December 13, 2000. 01-01007
01/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. As both appeals arise from the same district court proceeding and involve closely related claims, we consolidate the matters for all appellate purposes. Nos. 34200, 34638. Document No. 01-01063.
07/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these consolidated appeals shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 34200/34638 (01-11429).
07/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 34200/34638.
09/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These consolidated appeals arise from default judgments entered as discovery sanctions against appellant Great Star Cement. fn1[We note that default judgments were entered against all defendants in the case below, jointly and severally. These defendants include Great Star Cement Corp., Great Star Construction Corp., United Rock Products Corp. and E/I Worldwide Trading Corp. Great Star Cement Corp. was the only defendant to file a notice of appeal with this court. This order of affirmance only refers to appellant Great Star Cement Corp.] "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 34200/34638. 01-15183
10/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15369
10/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2001. 01-15369