judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL L. MARINARO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0014)
Case Number:S-07-0014Case Docketed On:01/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MICHAEL L. MARINARO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL L. MARINARO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael L. MarinaroDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 123
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/17/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/02/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2007Motion - Extension of time - to adjust due date of brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/01/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papersl; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Dion Custis for appellant, and Paul S. Rehurek for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Dion James Custis for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/20/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/22/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 8/21/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal