judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY M. GRAYSON, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0955
Short Caption:STANLEY M. GRAYSON, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:80-CF-0955Consolidated: 80-CF-1168 , 83-CF-0030
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2232-79Filed Date:08/18/1980

Opening Event Date:08/18/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/24/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/1984
Argued/Submitted:03/27/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantStanley M. Grayson, Jr.N
Gregory B. Macaulay NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas K. Clancy YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Bertrand Shipley Thomas YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAYSON JR., STANLEY M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 MACAULAYG VACATED 7/20/87
08/18/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/24/1980FiledRecord Completed
01/20/1984FiledBriefing Completed
03/27/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/25/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition