judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SITTON VS. SITTON

Case Information: 34988
Short Caption:SITTON VS. SITTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D151729Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10068
12/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-12638
01/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00429
01/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2000. 00-00429