judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KEVIN EUGENE KIDWELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0238)
Case Number:S-11-0238Case Docketed On:10/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KEVIN EUGENE KIDWELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KEVIN EUGENE KIDWELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKevin Eugene KidwellTina N. Olson
Diane M. Lozano
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 91
Citation:279 P.3d 540 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/17/2011Event - Phone Call - from counsel for Appellant re appointment. Advised that District Judge did not allow trial counsel to withdraw. Will contact Public DefenderEventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Tina Olson.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
10/20/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Dion Custis.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance - Tina N. Olson for AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw as CounselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2011Order - Other - Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
12/01/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/19/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/07/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/13/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/27/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/18/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/16/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal