judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INTERGRATED COMMUNITY SERVICE V. CLAUDIA MORELAND

Case Information: 11-AA-0401
Short Caption:INTERGRATED COMMUNITY SERVICE V. CLAUDIA MORELANDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00421-11Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerIntergrated Community ServicesNPro SeN
RespondentClaudia Moreland NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/30/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/30/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/31/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
04/12/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Integrated Community Services is a business that must be represtend by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
05/12/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
05/12/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED