judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHIP DAVE v. BILL VALDEZ, individually

Case Heading (S-11-0231)
Case Number:S-11-0231Case Docketed On:10/03/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:CHIP DAVE v. BILL VALDEZ, individually
Full Title:CHIP DAVE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BILL VALDEZ, individually, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChip DaveMichael William Stulken
AppelleeBill ValdezRichard H. Honaker

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees
Opinion Number:2012 WY 59
Citation:273 P.3d 485

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/03/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/03/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/28/2011Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
10/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Reinstatement of Appeal and Brief in Support of SameEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/15/2011Order - Granting Petition for Reinstatement of AppealOrderGrantFinal
12/14/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2012Brief - Appellee with statement of costs.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/01/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/10/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/14/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/14/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/13/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/01/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/07/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/3/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal