judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2742
B-2742
05/20/1971
Application for Writ of Error
INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
BEN A. CASH, DBA SPORTSMAN AERO SERVICE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/17/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/03/1971Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/26/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/24/1971Response to Motion filed
12/17/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/13/1971Letter Filed
12/08/1971Dissenting opinion issued.
12/08/1971Opinion issued
11/03/1971Supplemental Brief filed
07/28/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/26/1971Response to Petition
05/20/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/20/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ben A. Cash, dba Sportsman Aero ServiceRespondent
Insurance Company of North AmericaPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information