judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DC DEP'T OF REAL ESTATE SERVICES V. ADVANTAGE ENERGY, LLC

Case Information: 11-AA-0402
Short Caption:DC DEP'T OF REAL ESTATE SERVICES V. ADVANTAGE ENERGY, LLCClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Contract Appeals Board (CAB)
Lead:11-AA-0402Consolidated: 11-AA-0410
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CABD1199Filed Date:03/31/2011

Opening Event Date:03/31/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDistrict of Columbia Department of Real Estate SvcN
Richard S. LoveNY
Todd S. KimNY
RespondentAdvantage Energy LLCN
Gary J. Silversmith NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/31/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (No Fee due filed by DC Department Real Estate Services)
03/31/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
04/22/2011 Upon consideration of the petitions for review in these matter, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that petitions for review nos. 11-AA-402 and 11-AA-410 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Administrative Agency shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. (JAC)
06/28/2011RECORD ON APPEAL 9 volumes (in black 3 ring binders)dwm hearing of 7/6 & 12/06
06/28/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of petitioner/cross-respondent and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of respondent/cross-petitioner, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of petitioner/cross respondent. Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of petitioner/cross respondent, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the respondent/ brief of cross-petitioenr; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of respondent/cross-petitioner, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of petitioner/cross-respondent.
08/15/2011FiledBrief - (Advantage Engergy) 11-AA-410 (Respondent)
08/15/2011FiledAppendix (Advantage Energey) 11-AA-410 (Respondent)
08/15/2011FiledMotion to hold this appeal in abeyance (joint) (Petitioner)Granted
08/26/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion to hold this appeal in abeyance (joint) (Petitioner)
09/09/2011FiledMotion for Order Compelling Payment of Settlement and For Sanctions for Noncompliance with this Court's Order of August 26, 2011 (Respondent)Denied as Moot
09/14/2011FiledMotion of Advantage Energy for clarification of order 8/26/11 'AND' notice of withdrawal of emergency motion for order to complelling payment of settlement and for sanctions for non compliance with court's order 8/26/11 (Respondent cross Petitioner)Denied as Moot
09/19/2011FiledAnswer/Response - to respondent's motion for clarification of the Court's order of 8/26/11 (Petitioner)
09/22/2011FiledReply - to Petitioner's response to respondent's 9/14/11 notice and motion (Respondent)
09/27/2011FiledStatement from Advatage Energy, LLC regarding Status Report & Emergency Motion for an Order Requiring DC to make Disclosures on the Funding of the Settlement. (Respondent)
10/11/2011FiledAnswer/Response to respondents motion for order requiring petitioner to make disclosures on the funding of the settlement. (Petitioner)
10/28/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner District of Columbia Department of Real Estate Svc, Respondent Advantage Energy LLC)Granted
11/02/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner District of Columbia Department of Real Estate Svc, Respondent Advantage Energy LLC)
11/02/2011FiledDismissed
12/01/2011FiledMandate