judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUNS VS. MCKINZIE

Case Information: 34982
Short Caption:BRUNS VS. MCKINZIECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 27435Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/1999 / Puccinelli, AndrewSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David D. Loreman--check no. 005471.
10/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10039
10/20/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of entry of order filed 9/8/99. Due Date: 10 days
10/25/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: September 13, 1999. 99-10463
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Andrew Puccinelli. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 10, 2000. 99-12761
02/16/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-02423
03/03/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Certifying for Remand filed in district court on February 18, 2000. 00-03420
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a motion to remand, a voluntary motion to dismiss or a stipulation to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-05508
05/15/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Remitittur. 00-08115
07/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. On May 15, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to remand this matter to the district court for entry of an order pursuant to their settlement agreement. We approve the parties stipulation. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court pursuant to its certification, and we dismiss this appeal." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11653
07/10/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.