judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARD VENARD v. JACKSON HOLE PARAGLIDING, LLC, a Wyoming LLC, TOM BARTLETT, SCOTT HARRIS, MATT COMBS, JON HUNT, ANDREW FRYE, and JEFF COULTER

Case Heading (S-11-0232)
Case Number:S-11-0232Case Docketed On:10/05/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:EDWARD VENARD v. JACKSON HOLE PARAGLIDING, LLC, a Wyoming LLC, TOM BARTLETT, SCOTT HARRIS, MATT COMBS, JON HUNT, ANDREW FRYE, and JEFF COULTER
Full Title:EDWARD VENARD, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JACKSON HOLE PARAGLIDING, LLC, a Wyoming LLC, TOM BARTLETT, SCOTT HARRIS, MATT COMBS, JON HUNT, ANDREW FRYE, and JEFF COULTER, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdward VenardRobert N. Williams
P. Richard Meyer
AppelleeJackson Hole Paragliding, LLCCameron S. Walker
Timothy E. Herr
AppelleeTom BartlettCameron S. Walker
Timothy E. Herr
AppelleeScott HarrisCameron S. Walker
Timothy E. Herr
AppelleeMatt CombsCameron S. Walker
Timothy E. Herr
AppelleeJon HuntCameron S. Walker
Timothy E. Herr
AppelleeAndrew FryeCameron S. Walker
Timothy E. Herr
AppelleeJeff CoulterDavid G. Lewis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Venue
Opinion Number:2013 WY 8
Citation:292 P.3d 165

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/05/2011Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court, second notice. District Court originally gave notice case was ready to docket 08/16/2011 as Appellant did not order transcripts. Appellee requested reported hearing be transcribed and upon filing second notice was sent.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/05/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/21/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2012Brief - Appellees. Mr. Herr has not been admitted pro hac vice.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Jackson Hole Paragliding, LLC, Tom Bartlett, Scott Harris, Matt Combs, Jon Hunt, Andrew Frye, and Jeff Coulter.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2012Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Errata to Brief of AppelleesNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Brief of Appellees Jackson Hole Paragliding, LLC, Tom Bartlett, Scott Harris, Matt Combs, Jon Hunt, Andrew Frye, and Jeff CoulterEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Designation of record, Defendants' Supplemental Designation of RecordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/26/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/03/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from P. Richard Meyer obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Cameron S. Walker obo AppelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/29/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David Lewis obo AppelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/06/2012Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
03/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission of Nonresident Attorney Timothy E. Herr Pro Hac Vice; received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2012Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
03/14/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (P. Richard Meyer for Appellant and Cameron S. Walker and Timothy E. Herr, argument by Mr. Walker for Appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/14/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/17/2013Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2013Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/04/2013Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/04/2013Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/04/2013Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/08/2013Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for (no date)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal