Case Information: 78576 | |||
Short Caption: | ANSELMO (MICHAEL) VS. BISBEE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 67619 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/16/2019 | Filing Fee | Petition Filing fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | ||
04/16/2019 | Petition/Writ | Filed Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Ordering Respondents to Comply With The Nevada Supreme Court's Writ to Vacate 2014 Parole Denial. (SC) | 19-16567 | |
04/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) | 19-16574 | |
04/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) | 19-16575 | |
04/18/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer. Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ due: 14 days. (SC). | 19-17046 | |
05/02/2019 | Petition/Writ | Filed Respondents' Answer to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | 19-19436 | |
11/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Petitioner Michael Anselmo's Response due: 30 days. Respondents will have 15 days from service of Anselmo's response to file and serve any reply. (SC) | 19-46739 | |
12/13/2019 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | 19-50679 | |
01/06/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "We dismiss this petition." NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC). | 20-00618 | |
01/31/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC) | 20-04312 | |
01/31/2020 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) |