Case Information: 78582 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF CHANDAN MANANSINGH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/22/2019 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/17/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee waived. Bar Matter. (SC) | ||
04/17/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I and II. (SC) | 19-16806 | |
04/17/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument. (SC) | 19-16808 | |
05/22/2019 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. (SC) | ||
07/09/2019 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Order of Reinstatement. Chandan Manansingh is hereby reinstated to the practice of law in Nevada." En Banc. | 19-29108 | |
07/16/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order of Reinstatement. (SC) | 19-30140 | |
08/05/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | 19-32804 | |
08/05/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | ||
08/26/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by Bar Counsel on August 14, 2019. (SC) | 19-32804 |