judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SNAPP VS. SNAPP

Case Information: 38398
Short Caption:SNAPP VS. SNAPPCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV15666Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Venue
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/31/2001 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Humboldt County Clerk - check no. 7262.
08/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14654
08/29/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (Notice of Appeal) Due date: 10 days.
08/31/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/12/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Not typewritten). Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.
09/12/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Notice of Appeal. 01-15412
09/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15908
09/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-15572
09/24/2001Other Other. Mailed additional documents to Settlement Judge Carolyn Worrell.
11/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 31, 2001. 01-18820
03/29/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-05641
04/10/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 30. 02-06369
04/24/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-07276
09/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. 02-15713
09/27/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Filed Certificate of Imminent Settlement. 02-16752
12/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a motion to dismiss this appeal. In the alternative, appellant shall, within this same time period, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 02-21450
12/31/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Notice of Withdrawal. 02-22244
12/31/2002Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 02-22245
06/26/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On December 31, 2002, appellant moved for an extension of time to file a motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the document entitled "Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal" received on December 31, 2002. The notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to NRAP 42(b). The motion is granted and " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 03-10754
06/26/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 02-22245
06/26/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.