judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTHONY SILVEIRA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0242)
Case Number:S-11-0242Case Docketed On:10/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:ANTHONY SILVEIRA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANTHONY SILVEIRA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnthony SilveiraDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/16/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
12/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal with WaiverEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
12/19/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal