judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCKENDRY-VERHUNCE (RYAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38397
Short Caption:MCKENDRY-VERHUNCE (RYAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991712Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. 01-14653
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: August 30, 2001. 01-14857
09/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-16418
10/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16552
10/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2001. 01-16552