Case Information: 12-AA-1222 | |||
Short Caption: | ASANTEWAA NKRUMAH-TURE V D.C. DEP'T OF HUMAN SERVICES | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Human Services |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DHS00359-12 | Filed Date: | 08/01/2012 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/01/2012 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 10/26/2012 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/20/2013 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Asantewaa Nkrumah-Ture | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Human Services |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/01/2012 | Filed | Petition For Review (nunc pro tunc) | ||
08/03/2012 | Filed | Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Petitioner) | Granted | |
08/28/2012 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Petitioner), directing record | ||
08/28/2012 | Filed | Service Of Petition On OAH & Kim | ||
10/26/2012 | Filed | Record On Appeal | ||
10/26/2012 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/01/2012 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
12/24/2012 | Filed | Order - directing motion, brief & appendix (Petitioner) | ||
01/25/2013 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
01/25/2013 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
02/20/2013 | Filed | Mandate |