judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHANNON J. MIKO V. GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER

Case Information: 11-AA-0395
Short Caption:SHANNON J. MIKO V. GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTERClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES61-11Filed Date:03/29/2011

Opening Event Date:03/29/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerShannon J. MikoYPro SeN
RespondentGeorgetown University Law CenterN
Tonya M. Butler-TruesdaleNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/29/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/29/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/30/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG, DOES, OAH and Respondent
04/04/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/13/2011RECEIVED - courtesy copy of ltr from OAH to the petitioner regarding cost and preparation of transcript and that if payment is not made, the record will be certified on 6/28/11 without the transcripts. ta
06/28/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/15/2011FiledOrder Granting - PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/15/2011FiledService Of Petition On OAH & Milwee
09/16/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 3/2/11
09/16/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/06/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/22/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
12/16/2011FiledDismissed
12/16/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
01/10/2012FiledMandate