judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERGUSON VS. ADVANCED SCIENTIFIC SOLUTIONS

Case Information: 34972
Short Caption:FERGUSON VS. ADVANCED SCIENTIFIC SOLUTIONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9700537Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert E. Dickey--check no. 4678.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09990
10/18/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-10090
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-00457
01/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. 00-00794
02/08/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-02009
02/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-02498
03/13/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Notice of Settlement and Request for Settlement Judge to file Stipulation of Dismissal. 00-03962
03/24/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-04732
04/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Robert E. Dickey, Jr. shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court whether this matter is automatically stayed pursuant to the federal backruptcy code. Fn1[We defer ruling on the parties' stipulation to dismiss this appeal, pending attorney Dickey's response to this order.] 00-05649
04/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Status Report (from attorney Robert E. Dickey). 00-06113
06/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. We disapprove the parties' March 24, 2000 stipulation to dismiss this appeal, and we order this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Counsel for appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. 00-10391
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the status report of appellant's bankruptcy proceedings or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel. 00-21185
12/08/2000Other Other. Status Report. 00-21522
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Appellant's counsel shall file with this court an additional status report within 90 days from the date of this order. 01-04361
05/30/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 01-09051
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Status report due from appellant's counsel: 90 days from the date of this order. 01-14304
11/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 01-19464
03/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, Mr. Dickey shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceeding within 90 days from the date of this order. 02-03849
05/31/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 02-09578
07/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, Mr. Dickey shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceeding within 90 days from the date of this order. 02-12466
10/11/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 02-17640
11/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 11, 2002, appellant informs this court that the bankruptcy proceeding is still pending. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, appellant shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 120 days from the date of this order. 02-19185
02/26/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 03-03186
10/10/2003MotionFiled Motion. 03-16902
12/23/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for appellant shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 30 days from the date of this order. On October 10, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw. Because this matter is stayed pursuant to the mandatory stay provisions of federal bankruptcy law, we deny the motion. This denial is without prejudice, however, to counsel refiling the motion when the bankruptcy stay is no longer in effect. 03-21388
01/20/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 04-01080
02/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 19, 2000, this court entered an order disapproving the parties' stipulation to dismiss this appeal because it was stayed pursuant to the automatic stay provisions of federal bankruptcy law. The most recent report indicates that the stay is no longer in effect as the bankruptcy case has been dismissed. A copy of an order dismissing appellant's bankruptcy case is attached to the report. As the settlement judge has previously filed a report indicating that the parties had agreed to a settlement of this matter, appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b) or other wise inform this court of the status of this appeal. We caution appellant that failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 04-02432
02/19/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 04-03175
03/12/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on February 19, 2004, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 04-04686
03/12/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
04/02/2004Other Returned Mail. Order Dismissing Appeal addressed to David J. Otto remailed to corrected address.