judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BILL KUHL v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Case Heading (S-11-0221)
Case Number:S-11-0221Case Docketed On:09/21/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BILL KUHL v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Full Title:BILL KUHL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBill KuhlBernard Q. Phelan
AppelleeWells Fargo Bank, N.A.Matthew E. Turner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Employment Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 85
Citation:281 P.3d 716

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/21/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/21/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/31/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Errata - Appellant's briefNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
11/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - ErrataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting by Matt Turner obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting by Bernard Q. Phelan obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/18/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/15/2012Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (Bernard Phelan for appellant; Matthew E. Turner for appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/15/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/29/2012Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
07/02/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition for Re-HearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/10/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
07/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/10/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/10/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/3/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal