judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAYNES (AMANDA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34948
Short Caption:HAYNES (AMANDA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 25379Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09844
11/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time fo file Appellant's Fast Track Statement NRAP 3(C)(h)(3). 99-10865
11/09/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 14, 1999 and July 15, 1999. Court Reporter: Lola Sharp. 99-11030
11/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Counsel shall have 15 days in which to file the fast track statement and within 5 days of the date of this order, file with this court a file-stamped copy of the rough draft transcript request that was filed with the district court. 99-11907
12/17/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-12815
01/19/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00855
01/19/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.