judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ABE S. WHEELER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0041)
Case Number:S-10-0041Case Docketed On:02/18/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ABE S. WHEELER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: ABE S. WHEELER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAbe S. WheelerMichael D. Newman
Donna D. Domonkos
George Santini
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 161
Citation:265 P.3d 811 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/18/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/18/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Donna D. Domonkos as co-counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - George Santini for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/07/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/08/2010Service - Amended Certificate of Service (to entry of appearance of George Santini).ServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
04/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Certificate of ServiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/07/2010Brief - Petitioner reply (should have been e-filed as Brief - Appellant reply)BriefPetitioner replyFinal
06/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record (containing four volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/10/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/14/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, advised the motion needs to be e-filed and the original and six copies filed in the courtEventPhone CallFinal
12/15/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
12/15/2010Motion - Fees and costs (Amended)MotionFees and costsFinal
12/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and Amended Motion for Attorney's Fees.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal