judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT VERNON BARBETT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0362
Short Caption:ROBERT VERNON BARBETT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-15278-10Filed Date:03/17/2011

Opening Event Date:03/17/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/11/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert V. Barbett Y
Gregory S. SmithYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kenechukwu O. Okocha YN
Suzanne G. CurtNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/17/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/06/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Gregory Smith, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/06/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gregory Smith, Esquire
04/14/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6pgs/Tape) 10/18/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5pgs/Tape) 10/21/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (6pgs/Tape) 11/10/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (9pgs/Tape) 12/14/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (142pgs/Ransom-Jones) 12/15/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (12pgs/Paterson-Hart) 12/16/10 proc.
06/14/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (58pgs/Shelton) 12/16-17/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (11pgs/Richer) 12/20/10 proc.
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (12pgs/Tape) 2/23/11 proc. w/CD
06/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/17/2011RECORD INDEX
06/17/2011RECORD COPIES
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (47 pgs/tape) 12/16/10 proc. w/cd
07/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Until September 22, 2011) (Appellee)
09/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (73 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 12/14/10 proc.
09/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting All motions for extensions of time within which to file the briefs.
09/29/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/29/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/29/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/29/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/11/2012FiledArgued Before Jugde Oberly, Beckwith,Nebeker, Gregory S. Smith Esq.,for appellant, Kenechukwu O. Okocha Esq.,for appellee.
10/11/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Jugde Oberly, Beckwith,Nebeker) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Mr. Barbett's convictions on Counts 2 and 3, unlawful possession of a firearm by a felon and possession of an unregistered firearm are reversed, and this case is remanded to the trial court for further proceedings not inconsistent with this opinion)
10/19/2012FiledMotion for immediate issuance of the mandate (Appellant)
10/22/2012FiledOpposition to motion for issuance of the mandate (Appellee)
10/24/2012FiledReply in support of emergency motion for immediate issuance of mandate. (Appellant)
10/26/2012FiledOrder ORDERED that the motion for immediate issuance of the mandate is granted and the Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith. (OB,BE,NE)
10/26/2012FiledMandate