Case Information: 79769 | |||
Short Caption: | MGM GRAND HOTEL, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (FONSETH-SCHLOSSBERG) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A744671 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/08/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from L. Renee Green. (SC) | ||
10/08/2019 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | 19-41596 | |
10/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC) | 19-41598 | |
10/08/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC) | 19-41599 | |
10/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Motion for Stay Pending Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | 19-41668 | |
10/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Entry of Written Order and Imposing Temporary Stay. District Court Order due: 14 days. Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix due: 14 days. We temporarily stay the district court proceedings as to the NRCP 30(b)(6) witness depositions, only, pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition to the stay motion and further order of this court. Any opposition to the stay motion is due on or before October 15, 2019. (SC) | 19-41937 | |
10/15/2019 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Stay. (SC) | 19-42587 | |
10/16/2019 | Appendix | Filed Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix Re: Motion for Stay Pending Writ of Mandamus and Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | 19-42779 | |
10/21/2019 | Motion | Filed Petitioner MGM Grand Hotel, LLC's Reply to Respondent's Response to the Motion for Stay Pending Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | 19-43465 | |
10/24/2019 | Appendix | Filed Petitioner's Second Supplemental Appendix Re: Motion for Stay Pending Writ of Mandamus and Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (SC) | 19-44122 | |
10/29/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny as moot petitioner's motion for stay pending writ of mandamus and vacate the temporary stay ordered by this court on October 10, 2019.] NNP19-KP/RP/EC. (SC). | 19-44464 | |
11/25/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC) | 19-48097 | |
11/25/2019 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) |