Case Information: 14-BG-0014 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: WHITNEE GOINS, ET AL | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 01/07/2014 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/07/2014 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Whitnee Goins | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | Tamika Hawkins | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | Carmel Henry | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | Howard University School of Law Clinical Law Center | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | Committee on Admissions | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/07/2014 | Filed | Petition for Waiver of Rules | ||
01/07/2014 | Filed | Filing Fee Paid | ||
01/16/2014 | Filed | Order - ORDERED that this matter is referred to the Committee on Admissions for its recommendation as to whether the relief sought by the petitioner should be afforded by this court. (JAC) | ||
01/24/2014 | Filed | Report And Recommendation Of The Committee On Admissions On Referral that the petition to waive the criminal procedure requirement be granted and that these students be limited to handling civil matters only. (Respondent) | ||
02/03/2014 | Filed | Granted (GL,TH,KG) | ||
02/04/2014 | Filed | Order - (Amended) ORDERED that the petition for waiver is granted and Whitnee Goins, Tamika Hawkins, and Carmel Henry, law students, are authorized under D.C. App. R. 48 to engage in supervised practice, limited to civil law cases. (GL,TH,KG) |