judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYNARD (GEORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38401
Short Caption:LYNARD (GEORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45176
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR002322Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/30/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14665
08/29/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order Denying Motion to Suppress filed on May 29, 2001. Due Date: 10 days
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: May 29, 2001. 01-14859
09/11/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: Motion to Suppress, May 18, 2001. Court Reporter: Corrie L. Wolden. 01-15284
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/17/01. Court Reporter: Erin Luschar. 01-15520
10/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 15, 2001. 01-16869
10/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/12/01. Court Reporter: Wendy Pearson. Filed in district court on: 8/23/01. 01-17086
10/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/11/01 and 6/13/01. Court Reporter: Debbie Cecere. Filed in district court on: 8/23/01. 01-17088
10/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/13/01. Court Reporter: Connie Eisenberg. Filed in district court on: 8/23/01. 01-17089
10/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/17/01. Court Reporter: Erin Luscher. Filed in district court on: 8/23/01. 01-17090
10/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/18/01. Court Reporter: Corrie Wolden. Filed in district court on: 8/23/01. 01-17091
10/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-17293
10/29/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 13, 2001. Court Reporter: Constance S. Eisenberg. 01-18033
10/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 15, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-18197
11/01/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 11, 2001. Court Reporter: Debora L. Cecere. 01-18269
11/13/2001MotionFiled Motion. Request of Court Reporter for Extension of Time to File Appeal Transcript. 01-18853
11/13/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second request. 01-18892
11/15/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Request of Court Reporter for Extension of Time to File Appeal Transcript. 01-19102
11/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 13, 2001, court reporter Wendy Pearson file a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript. Ms. Pearson shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcripts. On November 15, 2001, appellant's counsel filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fat track statement. Appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-19820
11/30/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 12, 2001. Court Reporter: Wendy L. Pearson. 01-20119
12/28/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement. 01-21835
01/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 28, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Counsel for appellant is cautioned that no further extensions will be granted. 02-00341
01/17/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 02-01255
01/17/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 02-01256
02/12/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: February 13, 2002. 02-02810
02/14/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 02-02964
02/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 02-03452
04/01/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 15, 2002. 02-05720
04/16/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second). 02-06770
06/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 16, 2002, appellant filed a second motion for a second extension of time up to April 25, 2002. Because the time requested in the second motion as passed without a brief being submitted, we deny that motion as moot. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and supplemental appendix within 15 days from the date of this order. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-10232
06/28/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on Hand delivered 6/28/02. 02-11196
07/30/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 07/29/02. 02-13065
09/13/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
09/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-16805
09/30/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-19289
12/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-19656
12/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2002. 02-19656