judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARCIA BECKWITH v. KARL AND TINA WEBER, husband and wife, dba GROS VENTRE RIVER RANCH

Case Heading (S-11-0245)
Parent: S-11-0101 Case Docketed On:10/24/2011
Consolidated:S-11-0245
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:MARCIA BECKWITH v. KARL AND TINA WEBER, husband and wife, dba GROS VENTRE RIVER RANCH
Full Title:MARCIA BECKWITH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KARL AND TINA WEBER, husband and wife, dba GROS VENTRE RIVER RANCH, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarcia BeckwithGerard R. Bosch
AppelleeKarl WeberKatherine Lamere Mead
AppelleeTina WeberKatherine Lamere Mead

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Costs, Negligence, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/24/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/24/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/09/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2012Brief - Appellee and statement of costs.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees, Appellees' Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice Kite.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/30/2012Order - Consolidating cases for decisionOrderConsolidating casesFinal
02/14/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/14/2012Event - E-filing removed, Order assigning case to Expedited Docket uploaded with incorrect signature lineEventE-filing removedFinal
02/14/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/15/2012Order - Assignment of judge - Michael K. Davis, District Judge, is assigned to act in this matter for Chief Justice Kite who is recused.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/21/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/21/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/25/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Davis writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
05/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees/Defendants' Motion for Costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/22/2012Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/25/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal